EP0439971 - Bearing or rolling bearing in particular with abutting rolling elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/32] | Bearing or rolling bearing with abutting rolling elements | ||
[1994/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.N.R. ROULEMENTS Boîte Postale 17 1, rue des Usines 74010 Annecy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states S.N.R. ROULEMENTS Boîte Postale 17 1, rue des Usines F-74010 Annecy Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feppon, Philippe 5, rue de Seyssel F-74000 Annecy / FR | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Ernst-Schonberg, Michel, et al REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Service 02 67 8-10, Avenue Emile Zola 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Ernst-Schonberg, Michel, et al REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Service 02 67 8-10, Avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403315.6 | 23.11.1990 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | FR19900001056 | 30.01.1990 Original published format: FR 9001056 | [1991/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439971 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439971 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16C43/06 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
F16C33/42 (KR);
F16C43/06 (EP);
F16C33/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Lager oder Wälzlager insbesondere mit aneinanderstossenden Rollkörpern | [1994/38] | English: | Bearing or rolling bearing in particular with abutting rolling elements | [1994/38] | French: | Palier ou roulement notamment à corps roulants jointifs | [1991/32] |
Former [1991/32] | Lager oder Wälzlager mit aneinanderstossenden Rollkörpern | ||
Former [1991/32] | Bearing or rolling bearing with abutting rolling elements | Examination procedure | 14.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0157935 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]); | [Y]FR2023251 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB); | [A]FR2279971 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL]); | [A]FR2142793 (RKS); | [A]US2530660 (HOEFFLEUR ARTHUR V) |