EP0433137 - Method for the durable identification of glass sheets, use of the process and vehicle windows with such an identification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LU
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For:DE
VEGLA Vereinigte Glaswerke GmbH Viktoriaallee 3-5 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For:BE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LU
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
VEGLA Vereinigte Glaswerke GmbH Viktoriaallee 3-5 D-52066 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartetzko, Joachim M. Amselweg 37 W-5190 Stolberg / DE | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | de Toytot, Robert, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39 quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135 F-93303 Aubervilliers Cédex / FR | [1991/25] | Application number, filing date | 90403461.8 | 06.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | DE19893940749 | 09.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3940749 | [1991/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0433137 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0433137 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0433137 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/34, B60J1/00 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
B44C1/02 (EP,US);
C03C17/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE [1991/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum dauerhaften Kennzeichnen von Glasscheiben, Verwendung dieses Verfahrens und Kraftfahrzeugfenster mit einem Kennzeichen | [1991/25] | English: | Method for the durable identification of glass sheets, use of the process and vehicle windows with such an identification | [1991/25] | French: | Procédé pour l'identification durable de feuilles de verre, application du procédé et vitrage d'automobile pourvu d'une identification | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3325664 (HUBER PETER DIPL ING FH); | [X]FR2548962 (SAINT GOBAIN DESJONQUERES [FR]); | [X]DE16491 ; | [A]US4503437 (KATZSCHNER WOLFGANG [DE]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 11, 16 Mars 1981, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 85839U, SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED: 'TRANSFER-PRINTED COATINGS' page 99 ;colonne 2 ; |