EP0434534 - Assembly devices of back rests to corresponding seats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERTRAND FAURE AUTOMOBILE "B.F.A." Parc d'Activités du Moulin de Massy, 23 à 29, rue du Saule Trapu F-91300 Massy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states BERTRAND FAURE AUTOMOBILE "B.F.A." Parc d'Activités du Moulin de Massy, 23 à 29, rue du Saule Trapu F-91300 Massy / FR | ||
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states QUAKER OATS B.V. Stationsweg 43 NL-3331 LR Zwijndrecht / NL | ||
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states BERTRAND FAURE AUTOMOBILE 8, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud, B.P. 14 F-78391 Bois d'Arcy Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Courtois, Bernard 26 Rue des Chênes F-91150 Morigny-Champigny / FR | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Behaghel, Pierre CABINET PLASSERAUD 84 rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | [1991/26] | Application number, filing date | 90403625.8 | 17.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | FR19890016713 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8916713 | [1991/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434534 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434534 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44, F16B12/38 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
B60N2/00 (EP,US);
B60N2/68 (EP,US);
F16B3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1991/26] | Title | German: | Verbindungselemente für Rückenlehnen mit dazugehörigen Sitzen | [1991/26] | English: | Assembly devices of back rests to corresponding seats | [1991/26] | French: | Perfectionnements aux dispositifs d'assemblage des dossiers de sièges sur les assises correspondantes | [1991/26] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0171813 [ ] (KUSANKE KARL ERNST); | US2897927 [ ] (FITZGERALD ALBERT J); | US3403641 [ ] (BAKER HAROLD L); | US4148454 [ ] (CARLSON REUBEN E, et al) |