EP0437140 - Washing machine fitted with an overflow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIAPEM 137, rue de Gerland F-69007 - Lyon / FR | [1991/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pont, Hervé THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1991/29] | Phan, Chi Quy THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403742.1 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | FR19900000155 | 09.01.1990 Original published format: FR 9000155 | [1991/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437140 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437140 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, D06F39/02 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
D06F39/02 (EP,US);
D06F39/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1991/29] | Title | German: | Waschmaschine ausgerüstet mit einem Überlauf | [1991/29] | English: | Washing machine fitted with an overflow | [1991/29] | French: | Lave-linge muni d'un trop plein | [1991/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1564391 ; | [Y]GB1168561 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]); | [A]GB1231184 ; | [A]DE2134689 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US3566906 (BEARE ROBERT B) |