EP0380433 - Device to arrange, to disinfect and to dry shoes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blanc, Roger Route de Virieu F-38730 Le Pin / FR | For all designated states Kessler, Jean La Jonchère F-38137 Paladru / FR | [1990/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU B.P. 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420038.3 | 26.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | FR19890001564 | 27.01.1989 Original published format: FR 8901564 | [1990/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380433 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380433 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A43D95/10, A47L23/20, F26B9/00 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
A47L23/20 (EP);
A43D117/00 (EP);
A43D95/10 (EP);
F26B21/006 (EP);
F26B25/063 (EP);
F26B9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [1990/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einreihung, Desinfizierung und Trocknung von Schuhen | [1990/31] | English: | Device to arrange, to disinfect and to dry shoes | [1990/31] | French: | Installation pour le rangement, la désinfection, et le séchage des chaussures | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.03.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH107044 (BADEL JULES LOUIS [CH]); | [A]DE2455607 (RECKNAGEL FA HERMANN); | [AD]FR2406790 (BLANC ROGER [FR]); | [X]EP0180530 (BLANC ROGER [FR], et al) |