EP0389387 - Weft feeding device for air jet loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. SAURER DIEDERICHS 2 avenue Henri Barbusse 38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states S.A. SAURER DIEDERICHS 2 avenue Henri Barbusse F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fourneaux, Roger 7 rue Vaucanson F-38110 La Tour du Pin / FR | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU B.P. 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420123.3 | 08.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | FR19890004032 | 22.03.1989 Original published format: FR 8904032 | [1990/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389387 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/30, D03D47/34, D03D51/34 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
D03D47/3013 (EP,US);
D03D47/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1990/39] | Title | German: | Schussfadenliefervorrichtung für eine Webmaschine mit Strahleintrag | [1990/39] | English: | Weft feeding device for air jet loom | [1990/39] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en fil de trame pour machine à tisser avecinsertion pneumatique de la trame | [1990/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0225669 (PICANOL NV [BE]); | [A]EP0239137 (PICANOL NV [BE]); | [A]EP0023928 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]EP0023929 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [AD]EP0291486 (PICANOL NV [BE]); | [AD]EP0195469 |