EP0395544 - Insulated metallic substrates and method of making these substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Anonyme de Traitement des Métaux et Alliages (SATMA) 38570 Goncelin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states Société Anonyme de Traitement des Métaux et Alliages SATMA 38570 Goncelin / FR | ||
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states PECHINEY RECHERCHE (Groupement d'Intérêt Economique régi par l'Ordonnance du 23 Septembre 1967) Immeuble Balzac 10, place des Vosges F-92400 Courbevoie, La Défense 5 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabiet, Jacques Lotissement Bellevue F-38570 Goncelin / FR | 02 /
Gimenez, Philippe Résidence du Château, 3 rue Guy Mocquet F-38130 Echirolles / FR | 03 /
Guillou, Rémi 51, Avenue Camus F-44000 Nantes / FR | 04 /
Drapier, Claude Résidence du Bois du Roi, 53, route des Puits F-92420 Vaucresson / FR | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Mougeot, Jean-Claude, et al Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Mougeot, Jean-Claude, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [1990/44] | Vanlaer, Marcel PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420202.5 | 23.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | FR19890006136 | 24.04.1989 Original published format: FR 8906136 | [1990/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0395544 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395544 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/05, H01L23/14, C25D11/12 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
C25D11/12 (EP,US);
H05K1/053 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0116 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0315 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1147 (EP,US);
H05K3/386 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Isolierte metallische Substrate und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Substrate | [1990/44] | English: | Insulated metallic substrates and method of making these substrates | [1990/44] | French: | Substrats métalliques isolés et procédé de fabrication desdits substrats | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 22.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Request for further processing for: | 09.05.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.03.1996 | NL | 27.03.1996 | BE | 30.04.1996 | CH | 30.04.1996 | LI | 30.04.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | BE | 30.04.1996 | |
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | BE | 30.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2206451 (GLASS REGINALD JOHN, et al); | [Y]US2578400 (COHN CHARLES C); | [A]US3385732 (CURRAN ROBERT A); | [AD]DE3626232 (AKYUEREK SUSANNE [DE]); | [A]CH455008 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) |