EP0402281 - Connecting element for corrugated tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOFAX S.A. 6, rue des Bouvreuils F-25110 Baume les Dames / FR | [1991/06] |
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states SOFANOU S.A. Anteuil F-25340 Clerval / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lomberty, Marc 9, rue de la Gilebarde F-25110 Baume-les-Dames / FR | 02 /
Rougeot, Gabriel Le Vergoulot, Pouligney F-25640 Roulans / FR | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Moinas, Michel Cabinet Michel Moinas 13 Chemin du Levant 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | Moinas, Michel Cabinet Michel Moinas 13 Chemin du Levant F-01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420264.5 | 01.06.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | FR19890007749 | 07.06.1989 Original published format: FR 8907749 | [1990/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0402281 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0402281 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00, H02G3/06 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
F16L25/0036 (EP,US);
F16L25/0045 (EP,US);
H02G3/06 (EP,US);
Y10S285/903 (EP,US);
Y10T403/5766 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/50] | Title | German: | Verbindungselement für Wellrohre | [1990/50] | English: | Connecting element for corrugated tubes | [1990/50] | French: | Elément de raccord pour tubes annelés | [1990/50] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.1992 | DK | 02.09.1992 | GR | 02.09.1992 | NL | 02.09.1992 | ES | 02.06.1993 | SE | 02.06.1993 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
DK | 02.09.1992 | ||
GR | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.06.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
DK | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | NL | 02.09.1992 | |
SE | 02.06.1993 | ||
Former [1993/15] | NL | 02.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3711633 (GHIRARDI P, et al); | [AD]FR2355387 (MERCIECA SA [FR]); | [AD]US4443031 (BORSH RICHARD J [US], et al); | [AP]FR2629893 (SOFANOU SA [FR]) |