EP0421900 - Sealing of a cylindrical part, moving axially and/or rotarily in a chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foa, Michel La Ferventerie, Montigny/Avre F-28270 Brezolles / FR | [1991/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU BP 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420430.2 | 03.10.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | FR19890012953 | 04.10.1989 Original published format: FR 8912953 | [1991/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421900 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/24, F16J15/56 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
F16J15/24 (EP);
F16J15/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/15] | Title | German: | Dichtungseinrichtung für ein zylindrisch hin- und hergehendes oder drehendes Teil in einem Raum | [1991/15] | English: | Sealing of a cylindrical part, moving axially and/or rotarily in a chamber | [1991/15] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité pour organe cylindrique mobile axialement et/ou en rotation dans une chambre | [1991/15] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/25] | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2847236 ; | [A]FR2252513 ; | [A]GB2007777 | [XD] - K. TRUTNOVSKY: "Ber}hrungsdichtungen", vol. 2, 1975, page 196, Springer-Verlag, BerlinDE |