EP0432066 - Traction and flexion bench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELTALAB S.A. F-38340 Voreppe / FR | [1991/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyer, Jean-Claude Les Ecureuils, 1, Impasse des Soeurs F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion F-38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420524.2 | 04.12.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | FR19890016091 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8916091 | [1991/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432066 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432066 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/08, G01N3/20 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
G01N3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | Zug- und Biegungsgestell | [1991/24] | English: | Traction and flexion bench | [1991/24] | French: | Banc de traction et de flexion | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.07.1993 | CH | 31.12.1993 | LI | 31.12.1993 | [1994/48] |
Former [1994/16] | SE | 28.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1010503 ; | [A]DE1942736U | [A] - INDUSTRIAL LABORATORY. vol. 44, no. 10, octobre 1978, NEW YORK US pages 1455 - 1456; V.A. LOKSHIN ET AL.: "Device for mechanically testing curved specimens" | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Derwent Publ. Ltd Semaine 84/06, Abrégé no. 84-036062/06, M23, 21 mars 1984 & SU-A-1010-503 (METAL CUTTING EQUIP.), 07.04.83, & SU1010503 A 00000000 |