EP0435786 - Extrusion methods and apparatus, and structures produced therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN NATIONAL CAN COMPANY 8770 West Bryn Mawr Avenue Chicago Illinois 60631 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states AMERICAN NATIONAL CAN COMPANY 8770 West Bryn Mawr Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60631 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blemberg, Robert John 617 Wildrose Lane Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 02 /
Eckstein, John P. 1206 Glenayre Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 03 /
Curie, Kevin J. 2230, Thrush Lane Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 04 /
Nordness, Mark Edward 2025 Russet Court, No. 10 Appleton, WI 54914 / US | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Jacquet, Michel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel 69433 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Jacquet, Michel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420559.8 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | US19890458486 | 28.12.1989 Original published format: US 458486 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435786 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435786 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/06, B29C47/28, B29C47/14 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
B29C48/86 (EP,US);
B29C48/023 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/305 (EP,US);
B29C48/307 (EP,US);
B29C48/3366 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | Koextrusionsverfahren und -vorrichtung sowie damit hergestellte Strukturen | [1991/27] | English: | Extrusion methods and apparatus, and structures produced therewith | [1991/27] | French: | Procédés et dispositif de coextrusion et structures ainsi obtenues | [1991/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 06.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 01.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/52] | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62111715 ; | [X]JP59212233 ; | [A]US3949042 (UTZ KASTULUS); | [AD]US4379117 (BAIRD JR WILLIAM G, et al); | [A]EP0149321 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2182602 (REIFENHAEUSER MASCH); | [A]US4804510 (LUECKE ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]US4842791 (GOULD GORDON E [US], et al); | [A]EP0323043 (AMERICAN NATIONAL CAN CO [US]); | [X]EP0340655 (HIMONT ITALIA [IT]); | [A]EP0345987 (AMERICAN NATIONAL CAN CO [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 330 (M-636)(2777) October 28, 1987 & JP-A-62 111 715 (AKIRA KISHIMOTO ) May 22, 1987, & JP62111715 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 84 (M-371)(1807) April 13, 1985 & JP-A-59 212 233 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO K.K. ) December 1, 1984, & JP59212233 A 00000000 |