EP0383713 - Filtration device for a sea water aquarium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faure, Christian Cottage Magali, 419 route de Fréjus F-06210 Mandelieu / FR | [1990/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/34] | Application number, filing date | 90480022.4 | 13.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | FR19890002261 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: FR 8902261 | FR19900001484 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001484 | [1990/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383713 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01K63/04 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
A01K63/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1990/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Filterung von Aquarienseewasser | [1990/34] | English: | Filtration device for a sea water aquarium | [1990/34] | French: | Dispositif de filtration pour aquarium à eau de mer | [1990/34] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/41] | 14.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH482392 ; | [A]FR2490623 ; | [A]EP0283978 ; | [A]DE3416616 ; | [A]DE1204013 ; | [A]WO8102844 ; | [A]DE1461428 ; | [A]DE3107805 ; | [A]EP0069095 |