EP0413654 - Container dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YARKI S.A. Avda. Manuel Siurot 3 E-41013 Sevilla / ES | [1991/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monge, Antonio Camarasa Principe de Vergara 36 E-28001 Madrid / ES | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Garcia Cabrerizo, Francisco OFICINA GARCIA CABRERIZO S.L. Vitruvio 23 28006 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Garcia Cabrerizo, Francisco OFICINA GARCIA CABRERIZO S.L. Vitruvio 23 E-28006 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 90500054.3 | 15.06.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | ES19890002115 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: ES 8902115 | [1991/08] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413654 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07F13/10 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
G07F11/06 (EP);
G07F13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/08] | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung für Behälter | [1991/08] | English: | Container dispenser | [1991/08] | French: | Distributeur de conteneurs | [1991/08] | File destroyed: | 14.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/17] | 26.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0045146 ; | [A]EP0084695 ; | [A]EP0097593 ; | [A]AT340181B ; | [A]DE2318721 ; | [A]DE1449292 ; | [A]CH477063 ; | [A]FR2563927 ; | [A]US3299914 |