EP0430850 - A toy building set for building an engine construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 7190 Billund / DK | For:GB
Interlego AG Neuhofstrasse 21 6340 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 DK-7190 Billund / DK | ||
For:GB
Interlego AG Neuhofstrasse 21 CH-6340 Baar / CH | |||
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 DK-7190 Billund / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poulsen, Ole Vestergaard Urskovvej 6 DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | WITTRUP, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 90610071.4 | 28.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | DK19890006017 | 29.11.1989 Original published format: DK 601789 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0430850 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0430850 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04, G09B23/00 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
A63H33/042 (EP);
G09B25/02 (EP);
F02B75/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | Spielzeug-Bausatz zum Bau einer Motorkonstruktion | [1991/23] | English: | A toy building set for building an engine construction | [1991/23] | French: | Jeu de construction pour construire une structure de moteur | [1991/23] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE566731 (LEGRIT G M B H CARL LINDSTROEM, et al); | [A]NO116709B (FISCHER ARTUR [DE]); | [A]DK138205B (LEGO AS [DK]); | [A]DK148031B (INTERLEGO AG [DK]) |