EP0417028 - Method for fabricating crosslinked polyimide high temperature composites and resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scola, Daniel A. 83 Stonepost Road Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
Vontell, John H. 143 Carter Street Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 90630148.6 | 30.08.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | US19890401211 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: US 401211 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0417028 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0417028 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08J5/24, // C08L79:08 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
C08J2379/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von vernetzten Polyimidverbundmaterialien und -harzen bei hoher Temperatur | [1991/11] | English: | Method for fabricating crosslinked polyimide high temperature composites and resins | [1991/11] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de composites et de résines de polyimides réticulés à haute température | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/38] | 07.05.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4197339 (PAUL ROY D [US], et al) | [YP] - PLASTICS ENGINEERING. vol. 46, no. 1, January 1990, GREENWICH, CONN US pages 27 - 30; M. KANTZ: "processing of PMR-15 prepregs for high temperature composites"* whole paper |