EP0380450 - Coffee machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jura Elektroapparate-Fabriken L. Henzirohs AG Bahnhofstrasse 135 CH-4626 Niederbuchsiten / CH | [1990/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherer Benjamin Anemonenstrasse 30 CH-8047 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Ackermann Anton Hauptstrasse 374 CH-4855 Wolfwil / CH | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810063.9 | 25.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | CH19890000260 | 27.01.1989 Original published format: CH 26089 | [1990/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0380450 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0380450 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/42, A47J42/50 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
A47J42/50 (EP);
A47J31/3609 (EP);
A47J31/3614 (EP);
A47J31/3619 (EP);
A47J31/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1990/31] | Title | German: | Kaffeemaschine | [1990/31] | English: | Coffee machine | [1990/31] | French: | Machine à café | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/19] | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0154206 [ ]; | US4789106 [ ]; | FR2227669 [ ]; | DE3142348 [ ]; | DE935751 [ ]; | FR1019400 [ ]; | FR747345 [ ]; | [X]DE3316159 ; | [X]FR2424010 ; | [A]DE2435436 |