EP0385925 - Plaited vascular prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | For all designated states IMS-BIOPUR AG Südstrasse CH-8807 Freienbach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
For all designated states IMS-BIOPUR AG Südstrasse CH-8807 Freienbach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bittmann, Peter, Dr. Seminarstrasse 46 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Dittes, Peter Hasenweidstrasse 5 CH-8635 Oberdürnten / CH | 03 /
Flückiger, Hans Willikon CH-8618 Oetwil am See / CH | [1990/36] | Application number, filing date | 90810084.5 | 07.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | CH19890000740 | 28.02.1989 Original published format: CH 74089 | [1990/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385925 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385925 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61L27/00, D04H1/54 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
D04H3/007 (EP);
A61F2/06 (EP);
A61L27/16 (EP);
A61L27/18 (EP);
A61L27/507 (EP);
C08L23/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L23/06 (EP);
A61L27/18, A61L27/16, A61F2/06, C08L67/02, C08L23/06 (EP);
A61L27/18, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/18 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/36] | Title | German: | Geflochtene Gefäss-Prothese | [1990/36] | English: | Plaited vascular prosthesis | [1990/36] | French: | Prothèse vasculaire tressée | [1990/36] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1183497 (ETHICON INC [US]); | [A]FR2416686 (INST TEXTIL & FASERFORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]US4191218 (CLARK RICHARD E [US], et al); | [A]WO8002641 (BOWALD S [SE], et al); | [AD]WO8201647 (KASTER ROBERT L); | [Y]GB2115776 (ONTARIO RESEARCH FOUNDATION); | [Y]GB2139897 (MATTERSON SAMUEL ARTHUR); | [AD]EP0248246 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [AD]EP0248247 (SULZER AG [CH]) |