EP0390739 - Substituted aminopyrroles as stabilisers in chlorinated polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehner, Wolfgang, Dr. Wetzbach 34 D-6144 Zwingenberg / DE | 02 /
Wirth, Hermann O., Dr. Lessingstrasse 24 D-6140 Bensheim 3 / DE | [1990/40] | Application number, filing date | 90810218.9 | 19.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | CH19890001117 | 28.03.1989 Original published format: CH 111789 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390739 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390739 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390739 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/3415, C08L57/08, C07D207/34, C07D403/12, C07D403/14 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C08K5/3415 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3415, C08L57/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/40] | Title | German: | Substituierte Aminopyrrole als Stabilisatoren chlorhaltige Polymerisate | [1990/40] | English: | Substituted aminopyrroles as stabilisers in chlorinated polymers | [1990/40] | French: | Aminopyrroles substitués comme stabilisateurs de polymères chlorés | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2439284 (LEPETIT SPA); | [AD]EP0022087 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 23, Nr. 5, September-Oktober 1986, Seiten 1561-1564, Provo, US; E. TOJA et al.: "Pyrrolopyridine analogs of nalidixic acid. 2. Pyrrolo[3,4-b]pyridines" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 22, Nr. 1, Januar-Februar 1985, Seiten 83-88, Provo, US; S.M. BAYOMI et al.: "Synthesis of 7-oxopyrrolo[3,2-b]pyridine-6-carboxylic acid derivatives as potential antimicrobial agents" |