EP0391858 - Apparatus for flue gas recirculation in oil and gas burners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/41] | Method of flue gas recirculation in oil and gas burners | ||
[1995/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALSIGER, Benno Via al Mulino CH-6814 Cadempino / CH | [1990/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1994/32] | Braun, André, jr. Patentanwalt VSP, Murtengasse 5 CH-4051 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1994/28] | Braun, André Patentanwalt VSP, Murtengasse 5 CH-4051 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1990/41] | Braun, André Patentanwalt VSP Murtengasse 5 CH-4501 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810274.2 | 05.04.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | CH19890001334 | 07.04.1989 Original published format: CH 133489 | [1990/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0391858 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391858 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F23C9/08, F23D11/40, F23L7/00 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
F23L7/00 (EP);
F23C9/08 (EP);
F23D11/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Rauchgasrückführung bei Oel- und Gasbrennern | [1995/01] | English: | Apparatus for flue gas recirculation in oil and gas burners | [1995/01] | French: | Dispositif pour la recirculation du gaz de fumée dans des brûleurs à huile et à gaz | [1995/01] |
Former [1990/41] | Verfahren zur Rauchgasrückführung bei Oel- und Gasbrennern | ||
Former [1990/41] | Method of flue gas recirculation in oil and gas burners | ||
Former [1990/41] | Procédé pour la recirculation du gaz de fumée dans des brûleurs à huile et à gaz | Examination procedure | 05.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.01.1995 | SE | 04.04.1995 | [2000/04] |
Former [1996/03] | SE | 04.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3868211 (HAYE PAUL G LA, et al); | [A]DE2511500 (SMIT NIJMEGEN BV); | [A]DE2751524 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT); | [A]EP0139085 (BABCOCK WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]WO8602987 (BALSIGER BENNO [CH]); | [A]DE3509896 (KLAMKE RECORD OEL GASBRENNER [DE]); | [A]DE3618987 (SWOBODA WALTER [DE]); | [A]EP0275842 (LIDDO ANGELO NICOLA DI); | [A]EP0288031 (WEISHAUPT MAX GMBH [DE]) |