EP0404726 - Device for connecting c-shaped rails, especially mounting rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit AG Schachenstrasse 77 CH-8645 Jona / CH | [1990/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lechner, Peter Posthofstrasse 41 CH-8645 Jona / CH | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810439.1 | 15.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | CH19890002289 | 20.06.1989 Original published format: CH 228989 | [1990/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0404726 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0404726 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404726 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
E04B1/5818 (EP,US);
E03D11/143 (EP,US);
F16B7/0433 (EP,US);
F16B2200/205 (EP,US);
Y10T403/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von C-förmigen Schienen, insbesondere Montageschienen | [1990/52] | English: | Device for connecting c-shaped rails, especially mounting rails | [1990/52] | French: | Dispositif pour la connexion de rails en forme de C, en particulier rails de montage | [1990/52] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.08.1993 | ES | 11.08.1993 | GB | 11.08.1993 | [2002/25] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 11.08.1993 | |
GB | 11.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | GB | 11.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH507455 (METALLBAU HIRSCH [CH]); | [A]DE2232737 (SEEGER JULIUS HERMANN J); | [A]DE2448858 (PICHON JOSEPH); | [A]FR2333096 (VOGT FRIEDHELM [DE]); | [A]DE3410499 (GEBERIT AG [CH]) | Examination | CH667121 | EP0284122 |