EP0425443 - Injectable antiparasitic agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.09.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oechslein, walter, Dr. Bismattstrasse 19 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | 02 /
Gehret, Jean-Claude, Dr. Im Aeschfeld 12 CH-4147 Aesch / CH | 03 /
Hess, Ernst, Dr. Frostweg 3 CH-4124 Schönenbuch / CH | [1991/18] | Application number, filing date | 90810805.3 | 19.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | CH19890003898 | 27.10.1989 Original published format: CH 389889 | [1991/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0425443 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/17, A61K31/44, A61K9/00, A61K47/22, A61K47/00 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (KR);
A61K31/17 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K47/22 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/18] | Title | German: | Injizierbares parasitizides Mittel | [1991/18] | English: | Injectable antiparasitic agent | [1991/18] | French: | Agent antiparasitaire injectable | [1991/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 28.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/44] | 19.06.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62120318 ; | [A]JP63316737 ; | [AD]JP61263914 ; | [A]EP0331382 (PFIZER [US]) | [A] - DATENBANK: WPIL, Zugangsnummer: 87-189759, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-62 120 318 (T. KANEKO) 01-06-1987, & JP62120318 A 00000000 | [A] - DATENBANK: WPIL, Zugangsnummer: 89-043666, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-63 316 737 (TOYO JOZO) 26-12-1988, & JP63316737 A 00000000 | [AD] - DATENBANK: WPIL, Zugangsnummer: 87-003713, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-61 263 914 (Y. MIZUSHIMA) 21-11-1986, & JP61263914 A 00000000 |