EP0424328 - Driving assembly for motor vehicle sun curtains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITI INDUSTRIALE S.r.L Via Newton, 9 I-20016 Pero (Milano) / IT | For all designated states Traspadini, Gianluigi Via Streccia 34 21040 Venegono Superiore (Varese) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states ITI INDUSTRIALE S.r.L Via Newton, 9 I-20016 Pero (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Traspadini, Gianluigi Via Streccia 34 I-21040 Venegono Superiore (Varese) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Traspadini, Gianluigi Via Streccia, 34 I-21040 Venegono Sup. (Milano) / IT | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90830427.2 | 28.09.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | IT19890022049 | 18.10.1989 Original published format: IT 2204989 | [1991/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0424328 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0424328 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/20 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
B60J1/20 (EP);
Y02A30/24 (EP);
Y02B80/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/17] | Title | German: | Antriebsanordnung für Kraftfahrzeugsonnenvorhänge | [1991/17] | English: | Driving assembly for motor vehicle sun curtains | [1991/17] | French: | Dispositif d'acionnement pour rideaux de soleil de véhicule automobile | [1991/17] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/27] | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3413966 (HENSCHKE SIEGFRIED); | [X]DE3415930 (BAUMEISTER & OSTLER [DE]); | [Y]US4864201 (BERNOT RONALD J [US]) |