EP0478871 - Formation of contact plugs by blanket CVD deposition and etchback [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldi, Livio Via Dante, 26/28 I-20041 Agrate Brianza / IT | 02 /
Erratico, Pietro Viale Campania, 31 I-20133 Milano / IT | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Puccini, 7 I-21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 90830428.0 | 01.10.1990 | [1992/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478871 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478871 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H01L21/76879 (EP,US);
H01L21/7684 (EP,US);
Y10S438/963 (EP,US);
Y10S438/976 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/15] | H01L21/90 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Kontaktanschlüssen bei der alles überdeckenden CVD-Abscheidung und Rückätzen | [1992/15] | English: | Formation of contact plugs by blanket CVD deposition and etchback | [1992/15] | French: | Formation des prises de contact par dépôt-CVD sur toute une surface et décapage | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 24.10.1995 | Appeal received No. T0070/96 | 27.12.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.07.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 09.07.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.04.2004 | NL | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.07.2004 | DE | 29.07.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | NL | 28.04.2004 | |
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
DE | 29.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | SE | 28.07.2004 | |
DE | 29.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 28.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3636547 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0245627 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - PROCS. 1987 IEEE MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTION CONFERENCE 15-16/6/1987 pages 193 - 199; J.J. LEE ET.AL: "A STUDY OF TUNGSTEN ETCHBACK FOR CONTACT AND VIA FILL APPLICATIONS" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING. vol. 3, no. 3, August 1990, NEW YORK US pages 142 - 144; P.E. RILEY ET.AL: "DEVELPOMENT OF A MAGNETRON ENHANCED PLASMA PROCESS FOR TUNGSTEN ETCHBACK WITH RESPONSE-SURFACE METHOLOGY" |