EP0381642 - Endless track for a ski slope machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krainer, Norbert Frutjärnsvägen 9 771 41 Ludvika / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states Krainer, Norbert Frutjärnsvägen 9 S-771 00 Ludvika / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Kummelsten, Per Arne, et al UPPSALA PATENTBYRA P.O. Box 9013 750 09 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Kummelsten, Per-Arne, et al UPPSALA PATENTBYRA P.O. Box 9013 S-750 09 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 90850013.5 | 11.01.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | SE19890000098 | 12.01.1989 Original published format: SE 8900098 | [1990/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381642 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381642 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381642 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/28 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
B62D55/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [1990/32] | Title | German: | Pistenmaschinenlaufkette | [1990/32] | English: | Endless track for a ski slope machine | [1990/32] | French: | Chenille pour engin à damer les pistes de ski | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3390924 (ROBERT BUMBAUGH RALPH); | [A]DE2105482 ; | [A]US3829174 (THOMAS I); | [Y]US3883190 (KILBANE JR JAMES ANTHONY); | [Y]US4194583 (AAEN OLAV [US]); | [AP]DE8910021U ; | [AP]DE3816829 (SCHMIDT CHRISTIAN [DE]) | Examination | US2786283 | by applicant | US4194583 |