EP0394205 - Resilient connector for radio frequency signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 24101 Salo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kukkonen, Osmo Sillanpäänpolku 8 B SF-24130 Salo / FI | 02 /
Väyrynen, Antero Loukankatu 5 SF-24240 Salo / FI | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90850105.9 | 16.03.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | FI19890001745 | 12.04.1989 Original published format: FI 891745 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0394205 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0394205 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394205 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R17/12, H01R13/24 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
H01R13/2471 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/43] | H01R13/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | Federnder Steckverbinder für Radiofrequenzsignale | [1990/43] | English: | Resilient connector for radio frequency signals | [1990/43] | French: | Connecteur élastique pour des signaux de fréquence radio | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.1993 | BE | 15.12.1993 | CH | 15.12.1993 | DK | 15.12.1993 | ES | 15.12.1993 | GR | 15.12.1993 | IT | 15.12.1993 | LI | 15.12.1993 | NL | 15.12.1993 | LU | 31.03.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 15.12.1993 | |
BE | 15.12.1993 | ||
CH | 15.12.1993 | ||
DK | 15.12.1993 | ||
ES | 15.12.1993 | ||
GR | 15.12.1993 | ||
IT | 15.12.1993 | ||
LI | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
LU | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 15.12.1993 | |
BE | 15.12.1993 | ||
CH | 15.12.1993 | ||
DK | 15.12.1993 | ||
GR | 15.12.1993 | ||
IT | 15.12.1993 | ||
LI | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
LU | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.12.1993 | |
BE | 15.12.1993 | ||
CH | 15.12.1993 | ||
DK | 15.12.1993 | ||
IT | 15.12.1993 | ||
LI | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.12.1993 | |
BE | 15.12.1993 | ||
CH | 15.12.1993 | ||
DK | 15.12.1993 | ||
LI | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | AT | 15.12.1993 | |
BE | 15.12.1993 | ||
CH | 15.12.1993 | ||
LI | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 15.12.1993 | |
CH | 15.12.1993 | ||
LI | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | CH | 15.12.1993 | |
LI | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 15.12.1993 | |
LI | 15.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4138179 (MILLER CURTIS H, et al); | [A]US4494816 (TAMBURRO PETER J [US]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 20, no. 5, October 1977, NEW YORK US page 1761 Y.E.Chang: "Quick disconnect coaxial connector." |