EP0399977 - Apparatus and method for detecting focus errors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dewey, Anthony George 6613, Mt. Holly Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
Lenth, Wilfried 1870 - 43rd Avenue Capitola, CA 95010 / US | 03 /
Rugar, Daniel 228 Webster Street, Apt. D. Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/48] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB, SW Intellectual Property Dept. S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90850192.7 | 21.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | US19890357566 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: US 357566 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399977 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399977 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399977 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/135 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
G11B7/0917 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/133 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/1359 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/1381 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/48] | G11B7/09 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/48] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Detektieren von Fokusfehlern | [1990/48] | English: | Apparatus and method for detecting focus errors | [1990/48] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour détecter des erreurs de focus | [1990/48] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0164687 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 12, no. 298, August 15, 1988 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 72 P 744 * JP - A - 63 - 70 936 ( ASAHI OPTICAL CO. LTD ) * |