EP0420830 - Flywheel for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB VOLVO Assar Gabrielssons väg, Torslanda 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states AB VOLVO Assar Gabrielssons väg, Torslanda S-405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states AB VOLVO S-405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states AB VOLVO Assar Gabrielssons väg, Torslanda S-405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states AB VOLVO S-405 08 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grzegorz, Janiszewski Kryddkrassegatan 6 S-424 53 Angered / SE | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Hellbom, Lars Olof, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Hellbom, Lars Olof, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90850303.0 | 12.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | SE19890003091 | 20.09.1989 Original published format: SE 8903091 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420830 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420830 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/30, F16D3/12 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
F16F15/13178 (EP,US);
F16F15/13164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Schwungrad für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [1991/14] | English: | Flywheel for an internal combustion engine | [1991/14] | French: | Volant d'inertie pour moteur à combustion interne | [1991/14] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/26: Teilanmeldung 91117447.2 eingereicht am 12/09/90 | EPB 1995/26: Divisional application 91117447.2 filed on 12/09/90 | EPB 1995/26: Demande divisionnaire 91117447.2 déposée le 12/09/90 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91117447.2 / EP0476707 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.1995 | BE | 28.06.1995 | CH | 28.06.1995 | DK | 28.06.1995 | ES | 28.06.1995 | FR | 28.06.1995 | IT | 28.06.1995 | LI | 28.06.1995 | NL | 28.06.1995 | GB | 28.09.1995 | SE | 28.09.1995 | LU | 30.09.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/11] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
DK | 28.06.1995 | ||
ES | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
NL | 28.06.1995 | ||
GB | 28.09.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
DK | 28.06.1995 | ||
ES | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
GB | 28.09.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
NL | 30.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
DK | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
GB | 28.09.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
NL | 30.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
DK | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
GB | 28.09.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
DK | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
GB | 28.09.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
DK | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
GB | 28.09.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/47] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
GB | 28.09.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/18] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | CH | 28.06.1995 | |
LI | 28.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | GB2168784 [ ] (FICHTEL & SACHS AG); | US4747801 [ ] (CHASSEGUET GUSTAVE [FR], et al); | GB2198212 [ ] (VOITH GMBH J M); | US4816006 [ ] (FRIEDMANN OSWALD [DE]); | US4850932 [ ] (KAGIYAMA JUNJI [JP], et al); | DE3901123 [ ] (VALEO [FR]) |