EP0398857 - Method for azide displacement of alpha-triflates of 1,5-lactones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167 / US | ||
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleet, George William John, Dep. of Organic Chem. University of Oxford, South Parks Road Oxford OX1 3QY / GB | 02 /
Bruce, Ian, Department of Organic Chemistry University of Oxford, South Parks Road Oxford OX1 3QY / GB | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Ernst, Hubert, et al Monsanto Services International S.A./N.V. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No. 21 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | Ernst, Hubert, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [1990/47] | Lunt, John Cooper Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 L.Box 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 90870067.7 | 14.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890352068 | 15.05.1989 Original published format: US 352068 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0398857 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0398857 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07B43/00, C07D493/04, // (C07D493/04, 317:00, 311:00) | [1990/47] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Substitution des alpha-Triflatrestes in 1,5-Lactonen durch Azide | [1990/47] | English: | Method for azide displacement of alpha-triflates of 1,5-lactones | [1990/47] | French: | Procédé pour le déplacement d'un azide à la place d'alpha-triflates de 1,5 lactones | [1990/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/34] | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - TETRAHEDRON, vol. 46, no. 1, January 1990, pages 19-32, Pergamon Press, Oxford, GB; I. BRUCE et al.: "Retention and apparent inversion during azide displacement of alpha-triflates of 1,5-lactones" | [XP] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 30, no. 51, December 1989, pages 7257-7260, Pergamon Press, Oxford, GB; I. BRUCE et al.: "Iminoheptitols as glycosidase inhibitors: synthesis of, and mannosidase and fucosidase inhibition by, alpha-homomannojirmiycin and 6-epi-homomannojirimycin" | [A] - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, vol. 175, no. 2, 1988, pages 249-264, Elsevier Science Publishers, Amsterdam, NL; J. KUSZMANN et al.: "Application of the bucherer reaction to carbohydrate derivatives" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS I, no. 8, August 1987, pages 1785-1791, Royal Society of Chemistry, London, GB; P.D. BAIRD et al.: "Synthesis of (2R,3S,4R)-3,4-dihydroxyproline from D-ribonolactone; an approach to the synthesis of polyfunctionalised D-amino acids from sugar lactones. X-Ray molecular structures of 2-azido-3,4-O-(R)-benzylidene-2-deoxy-D-ribono-1,5-lactone, 2-azido-2-deoxy-D-ribono-1,4-lactone, and (2R,3S,3R)-3,4-dihydroxyproline" |