EP0381663 - Door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEWALD GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Industriestrasse 1 A-2486 Pottendorf / AT | [1990/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bailer, Bruno Haupstrasse 48 A-2486 Pottendorf, Landegg / AT | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Itze, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Wilhelm Casati & Peter Itze Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Amerlingstrasse 8 A-1061 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 90890017.8 | 25.01.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | AT19890000148 | 26.01.1989 Original published format: AT 14889 | [1990/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0381663 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/48 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
E06B3/485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/32] | Title | German: | Tor | [1990/32] | English: | Door | [1990/32] | French: | Porte | [1990/32] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/40] | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2557716 ; | [X]AT382423B ; | [X]FR2458665 ; | [X]DE216816 ; | [A]DE3121900 |