EP0383747 - Supporting arrangement for casting ladles at a continuous casting plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.05.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheurecker, Werner Prechtlerstrasse 15 A-4030 Linz / AT | 02 /
Spannlang, Ronald Voltastrasse 3 A-4040 Linz / AT | 03 /
Kalmar, Istvan, Dipl.-Ing. Wettengelgasse 1-13/65 A-1232 Wien / AT | 04 /
Leutgöb, Manfred Tulpengasse 2 A-4482 Ennsdorf / AT | 05 /
Schertler, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Neudorfer Strasse 30 A-2353 Guntramsdorf / AT | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Kopecky, Helmut Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2008/38] |
Former [1994/15] | Kopecky, Helmut, Dipl.Ing. Zollergasse 37/5 A-1070 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1990/34] | Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 90890030.1 | 08.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | AT19890000335 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: AT 33589 | [1990/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383747 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383747 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383747 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D41/00 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
B22D41/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/34] | Title | German: | Trageinrichtung für Giesspfannen bei einer Stranggiessanlage | [1990/34] | English: | Supporting arrangement for casting ladles at a continuous casting plant | [1990/34] | French: | Dispositif de support pour des poches de coulée dans une installation de coulée continue | [1990/34] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.12.1993
02.03.1994
ADMISSIBLE CONCAST STANDARD AG Tödistrasse 7 CH-8027 Zürich / CH | [1994/08] | 07.03.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.06.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.02.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.02.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0277846 (CLECIM SA [FR]); | [AD]DE2430786 (VALLOUREC LORRAINE ESCAUT); | [A]FR2070894 (DEMAG AG); | [A]FR2535633 (CLECIM SA [FR]); | [A]FR1581054 |