EP0385967 - Coupling element for hanger links [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steirische Kettenfabriken Pengg-Walenta KG Theodor-Körner Strasse 59 A-8021 Graz / AT | [1990/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walenta, Gerhart, Dipl.-Ing. Baumschulgasse 18 A-8010 Graz / AT | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Matschnig, Franz Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Siebensterngasse 54 Postfach 252 A-1070 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1990/36] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Siebensterngasse 54 A-1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 90890036.8 | 15.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | AT19890000489 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: AT 48989 | [1990/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0385967 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0385967 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16G15/06, B66C1/12 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
F16G15/06 (EP);
F16G15/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/36] | F16G15/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1990/36] | Title | German: | Verbindungsstück für Kettengehänge | [1990/36] | English: | Coupling element for hanger links | [1990/36] | French: | Elément de liaison pour manilles de levage | [1990/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/50] | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2819986 ; | [A]DE3118211 ; | [A]DE1675833 ; | [AD]DE1425411 ; | [AD]DE3048565 ; | [AD]US4429526 |