EP0414656 - Assemblable bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soucek, Mildred, verstorben, gesetzlich vertreten durch Dr. C. Moshammer, Notarsubstitut, Landstrasse Hauptstrasse 27 A-1030 Wien / AT | [1991/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/09] | Application number, filing date | 90890231.5 | 30.07.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | AT19890001916 | 10.08.1989 Original published format: AT 191689 | [1991/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414656 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A45C7/00 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
A45C13/00 (EP);
A45C3/00 (EP);
A45C3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1991/09] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzbare Tasche | [1991/09] | English: | Assemblable bag | [1991/09] | French: | Poche à assembler | [1991/09] | File destroyed: | 28.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/20] | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time [1992/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.1991 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.1991 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.1991 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.1991 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 30.09.1990 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [1991/09] | 21.10.1991 | Resumption of proceedings | [1991/39] | 30.09.1990 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [1991/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0211975 ; | [X]GB2018580 ; | [X]US3994372 |