EP0409993 - COMPOSITE SHEET FOR FIBER-REINFORCED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARAGUCHI, Keiichi 1645-56, Kusatsu-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Fumigo 528-18, Tomiyama-cho Nobeoka-shi Miyazaki 882 / JP | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90900343.6 | 15.12.1989 | [1991/05] | WO1989JP01265 | Priority number, date | JP19880315091 | 15.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31509188 | JP19890085756 | 06.04.1989 Original published format: JP 8575689 | [1991/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9007024 | Date: | 28.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409993 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409993 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D04H5/02, D04H3/10, C08J5/24, C08J5/04 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
D04H1/48 (EP);
B29B15/105 (EP);
D04H18/04 (EP);
D04H5/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/05] | D04H5/02, D04H3/10, C08J5/04, C08J5/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/05] | Title | German: | KOMPOSIT-BLATT FÜR FASERVERSTÄRKTES MATERIAL | [1991/05] | English: | COMPOSITE SHEET FOR FIBER-REINFORCED MATERIAL | [1991/05] | French: | FEUILLE COMPOSITE POUR MATERIAU RENFORCE PAR DES FIBRES | [1991/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1990 | Translation filed | 11.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1990 | Search fee paid | 11.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB946693 (CHICOPEE MFG CORP); | [A]FR2248362 (AMYOT LOUIS [FR]); | [Y]US3914497 (KANEHIRA HIROSHI, et al); | [A]US4190695 (NIEDERHAUSER DONALD O [US]); | [A]EP0043390 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0176847 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | International search | JPS5373267 [ ] (TOHO BESLON CO, et al); | JPS57178720 [ ] (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | JPS6028543 [ ] (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | JPS60209033 [ ] (CELANESE CORP); | JPH0197257 [ ] (SHINWA KK); | JPH01132862 [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) | Examination | JPH0197257 |