EP0447452 - HIGH TEMPERATURE TURBINE ENGINE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. Law Department, P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. Law Department, P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYD, Gary, L. 400 Howell Av. no. 4 Orland, Wyoming 82401 / US | [1991/41] |
Former [1991/39] | 01 /
BOYD, Gary, L. 4906 S. Calle Los Cerros Tempe, AZ 85282 / US | Representative(s) | Poidatz, Emmanuel Conseil en Brevets d'Invention 96, Boulevard Malesherbes 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Poidatz, Emmanuel Conseil en Brevets d'Invention 96, Boulevard Malesherbes F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90900600.9 | 15.09.1989 | [1991/39] | WO1989US04041 | Priority number, date | US19880280760 | 06.12.1988 Original published format: US 280760 | [1991/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006422 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447452 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447452 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F01D25/00, F16B35/00 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
F01D25/005 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F16B35/00 (EP,US);
F05D2300/21 (EP,US);
Y10S411/90 (EP,US);
Y10T403/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | HOCHTEMPERATURSTRUKTUR EINER GASTURBINE | [1991/39] | English: | HIGH TEMPERATURE TURBINE ENGINE STRUCTURE | [1991/39] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TURBOMOTEUR HAUTE TEMPERATURE | [1991/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 18.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP58178900 ; | [A]JP55107120 ; | [A]GB962057 (BMW TRIEBWERKBAU GMBH); | [A]GB1312339 (NAT RES DEV) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 020 (M-271) 27 January 1984, & JP-A-58 178900 (ASAHI GLASS KK) 19 October 1983, see the whole document, & JP58178900 A 19831019 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 158 (M-039) 05 November 1980, & JP-A-55 107120 (TOYOTA) 16 August 1980, see the whole document, & JP55107120 A 19800816 |