EP0447453 - COUPLER WITH COMBINATION LOCKING AND BONDING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANLEY AVIATION CORPORATION 2501 Dallas Street Aurora, CO 80010 / US | [1991/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALE, Edwin, J. 11774 E. 2nd Avenue Aurora, CO 80010 / US | 02 /
OLSEN, Albert, B. 3621 East Orchard Road Littleton, CO 80121 / US | 03 /
DINSMOOR, John, C. 2522 West 100th Avenue Denver, CO 80221 / US | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Foster, David Martyn, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Foster, David Martyn, et al MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90900609.0 | 06.12.1989 | [1991/39] | WO1989US05522 | Priority number, date | US19880283161 | 12.12.1988 Original published format: US 283161 | [1991/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9007076 | Date: | 28.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447453 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447453 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/00, H01R13/639 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
F16L25/01 (EP,US);
F16L19/005 (EP,US);
H01R13/639 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG MIT EINEM KOMBINIERTEN SPERR- UND VERBINDUNGSRING | [1991/39] | English: | COUPLER WITH COMBINATION LOCKING AND BONDING RING | [1991/39] | French: | COUPLEUR A BAGUE DE BLOCAGE ET DE FIXATION COMBINEES | [1991/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4808117 [ ] (GALE EDWIN J [US], et al); | US4487462 [ ] (GALE EDWIN J [US], et al); | US3669472 [ ] (NADSADY CLARENCE A) |