EP0448620 - FREIGHT HOISTING ARRANGEMENT, ESPECIALLY FOR USE ON BOARD SHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSPORT SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT A/S Boks 40 5154 Mongstad / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states TRANSPORT SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT A/S Boks 40 N-5154 Mongstad / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hopland, Moritz - 5130, Austrheim / NO | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 90901050.6 | 11.12.1989 | [1991/40] | WO1989NO00128 | Priority number, date | NO19880005563 | 15.12.1988 Original published format: NO 885563 | [1991/40] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006882 | Date: | 28.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448620 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448620 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B63B27/16 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
B63B27/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | LASTHEBEANORDNUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR VERWENDUNG AUF SCHIFFEN | [1993/13] | English: | FREIGHT HOISTING ARRANGEMENT, ESPECIALLY FOR USE ON BOARD SHIPS | [1991/40] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE LEVAGE DE FRET, UTILISE NOTAMMENT A BORD DE NAVIRES | [1991/40] |
Former [1991/40] | LASTHEBEANORDNUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR VERWENDUNG AUF SCHIFFEN 90901050INVT 9 ô k? | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1990 | Translation filed | 06.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 06.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 19.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.1993 | BE | 31.03.1993 | CH | 31.03.1993 | ES | 31.03.1993 | FR | 31.03.1993 | IT | 31.03.1993 | LI | 31.03.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 31.03.1993 | |
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
ES | 31.03.1993 | ||
IT | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 31.03.1993 | |
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
IT | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 31.03.1993 | |
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
IT | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 31.03.1993 | |
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | BE | 31.03.1993 | |
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/03] | BE | 31.03.1993 | |
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 31.03.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0268572 ; | [A]NO139162B ; | [A]DE2628734 |