EP0449964 - DISTRIBUTED SWITCHING ARCHITECTURE FOR COMMUNICATION MODULE REDUNDANCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CODEX CORPORATION 20 Cabot Boulevard Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states CODEX CORPORATION 20 Cabot Boulevard Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEREN-ZVI, Joseph 17 Rob's Lane Sharon, MA 02067 / US | 02 /
KING, Wayne, M. 136 Bailey Street Canton, MA 02021 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90901432.6 | 21.12.1989 | [1991/41] | WO1989US05728 | Priority number, date | US19880288788 | 22.12.1988 Original published format: US 288788 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9007827 | Date: | 12.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449964 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449964 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
G06F11/2005 (EP,US);
G06F11/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | VERTEILTER SCHALTUNGSAUFBAU FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSMODULREDUNDANZ | [1991/41] | English: | DISTRIBUTED SWITCHING ARCHITECTURE FOR COMMUNICATION MODULE REDUNDANCY | [1991/41] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DECENTRALISEE DE COMMUTATION A MODULES REDONDANTS DE COMMUNICATION | [1991/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1991 | Search fee paid | 19.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 19.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.1996 | BE | 23.10.1996 | CH | 23.10.1996 | IT | 23.10.1996 | LI | 23.10.1996 | NL | 23.10.1996 | LU | 31.12.1996 | SE | 23.01.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 23.10.1996 | |
BE | 23.10.1996 | ||
CH | 23.10.1996 | ||
IT | 23.10.1996 | ||
LI | 23.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
SE | 23.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 23.10.1996 | |
BE | 23.10.1996 | ||
IT | 23.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
SE | 23.01.1997 | ||
CH | 28.01.1997 | ||
LI | 28.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 23.10.1996 | |
BE | 23.10.1996 | ||
IT | 23.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
SE | 23.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.10.1996 | |
BE | 23.10.1996 | ||
IT | 23.10.1996 | ||
SE | 23.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 23.10.1996 | |
BE | 23.10.1996 | ||
SE | 23.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 23.10.1996 | |
BE | 23.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 23.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3252149 (WEIDA ROBERT L, et al); | [Y]US4486829 (MORI KINJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4623883 (KONEN NOEL R [US]); | [X]US4628508 (SAGER JOHN C [GB], et al) | International search | [A]US4141066 (KEILES YOEL); | [A]US4356546 (WHITESIDE ARLISS E, et al); | [Y]US4486829 (MORI KINJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4623883 (KONEN NOEL R [US]); | [X]US4628508 (SAGER JOHN C [GB], et al); | [A]US4774709 (TULPLUE BHALCHANDRA R [US], et al) |