EP0419587 - SINGLE-USE, THROW-AWAY BRUSHING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR TEETH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAURY, Jacques 6, impasse des Myrtes F-11100 Narbonne / FR | [1991/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Ravina, Bernard Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse 31700 Blagnac / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Ravina, Bernard Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse 31700 Blagnac / FR | ||
Former [1991/14] | Ravina, Bernard RAVINA S.A. 24, boulevard Riquet F-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 90901649.5 | 02.01.1990 | [1991/14] | WO1990FR00003 | Priority number, date | FR19890002001 | 09.02.1989 Original published format: FR 8902001 | [1991/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009122 | Date: | 23.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419587 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419587 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A46B11/00 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
A46B11/0079 (EP);
A46B11/0041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | EINWEGBÜRSTE, INSBESONDERE FÜR DIE ZÄHNE | [1991/14] | English: | SINGLE-USE, THROW-AWAY BRUSHING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR TEETH | [1991/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BROSSAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR LES DENTS, A USAGE UNIQUE, JETABLE APRES USAGE | [1991/14] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.1993 | 31.01.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.1994 | 31.01.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 30.08.1995 | NL | 30.08.1995 | SE | 30.11.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 30.08.1995 | |
SE | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | SE | 30.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2705335 (GLASSMAN JACOB A, et al); | [A]US2766472 (DURRETT CHARLES S); | [A]FR1265175 ; | [A]US3408150 (RUBIN FIGA); | [A]FR2579874 (PICHON JEAN FRANCOIS [FR]) |