EP0509985 - BACTERIOLYTIC ENZYME NATIVE TO A NOCARDIOPSIS STRAIN, ITS PRODUCTION AND USE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chi-Li 41-43 Starr Avenue No. 2 Danbury, CT 06811 / US | 02 /
BECK, Carol, Marie 20 Huntington, Ct Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 03 /
OVERHOLT, Janet, M. Unit 17-6 166 Old Brookfield Rd. Danbury, CT 06811 / US | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Knudsen, Sten Lottrup, et al Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | Knudsen, Sten Lottrup, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S, Patent Department, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 90902767.4 | 11.01.1990 | [1992/44] | WO1990DK00009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110723 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509985 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509985 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/06, C12N9/36, C11D3/386, // (C12N9/36, C12R1:365) | [1992/44] | CPC: |
A23L3/3463 (EP);
A61K8/66 (EP);
A61L2/18 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP);
C02F3/342 (EP);
C11D3/0068 (EP);
C11D3/38636 (EP);
C11D3/38663 (EP);
C11D3/38672 (EP);
C12N1/06 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12N9/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/44] | Title | German: | AUS EINEM NOCARDIOPSIS-STAMM STAMMENDES BAKTERIOLYTISCHES ENZYM, SEINE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1992/44] | English: | BACTERIOLYTIC ENZYME NATIVE TO A NOCARDIOPSIS STRAIN, ITS PRODUCTION AND USE. | [1992/44] | French: | ENZYME BACTERIOLYTIQUE NAISSANT D'UNE SOUCHE DE $i(NOCARDIOPSIS), PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE ENZYME | [1992/44] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.04.1994 | LI | 13.04.1994 | [1994/48] | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1268173 ; | [Y]JP63234096 ; | [A]DD200432 ; | [A]FR1518511 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK); | [A]US3682778 (KAWAI MASANOBU, et al); | [Y]US4828998 (WOEHNER GERHARD [DE], et al) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 76, No. 25, 19 June 1972, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 325, Abstract 152061c, & GB-A-1 268 173 (Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd.) 1972, & GB1268173 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 103, No. 14, 7 October 1985, (Columbus, Ohio, US), SUZUKI, KEITAROU et al: "Serratia-lytic enzyme produced by Streptomyces sp. strain No. 177", see page 404, Abstract 209553x, & Agric. Biol. Chem. 1985, 49 (10), 3049-3050 | [Y] - Dialog Information Services, File 5, BIOSIS, BIOSIS number 84018801, accession no. 0017541741, TSIREKIDZE L G et al: "Actinomycetes of some hot springs in the georgian-ssr USSR and their lytic activity", Soobshch akad nauk gruz ssr 124 (1), 1986 (RECD.1987), 165-168 | [Y] - TIBTECH, Vol. 5, 1987 B.A. ANDREWS et al: "Enzymatic lysis and disruption of microbial cells", see page 273 - page 277 see page 274 left column line 22-23 and table 2 page 276 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 112, No. 4, 22 January 1990, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 114, Abstract 22800u, & JP,A,63 234 096 (IMAI, SATOSHI) 1988, & JP63234096 A 19900122 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 99, No. 13, 26 September 1983, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 471, Abstract 103739w, & DD-A-200 432 (FLECK, WERNER et al) 1983, & DD200432 A 00000000 | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 76, no. 25, 19. June 1972 (Columbus, Ohio, US) s. p. 325 abstract 152061c, & GB, 1268173 (Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd.)1972 | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 103, no. 14, 7 October 1985, (Columbus, Ohio, US), Suzuki, Keitarou et al; s. p. 404, abstract 209553x, & Agric. Biol. Chem. 1985, 49(10), 3049-3050 | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 112, no. 4, 22 January 1990, (Columbus, Ohio, US), s. p. 114, abstract 22800u, & JP, 63234096 (Imai, Satoshi) 1988 | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 99, no. 13, 26 September 1983 (Columbus, Ohio, US) s. p. 471, abstract 103739w, & DD,, 200432 (Fleck, Werner et al) 1983 |