EP0458825 - APPARATUS FOR DRYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/49] | DRYING | ||
[1995/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Kodak Limited P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | |||
Former [1991/49] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLOVER, Edward, Charles, Timothy, Samuel 48 Hermitage Lane London NW2 / GB | 02 /
GLOVER, Martyn, Stuart 83 Westlea Avenue Garston Watford Hertfordshire WD2 4NJ / GB | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Mackett, Margaret, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903027.2 | 08.02.1990 | [1991/49] | WO1990GB00191 | Priority number, date | GB19890003064 | 10.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8903064 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009621 | Date: | 23.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458825 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458825 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03D15/02, F26B25/22 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
F26B25/22 (EP);
G03D15/02 (KR);
F26B3/283 (EP);
G03D15/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/14] |
Former [1991/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | TROCKNUNGSGERÄT | [1995/02] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DRYING | [1995/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE SECHAGE | [1995/02] |
Former [1991/49] | TROCKNUNG | ||
Former [1991/49] | DRYING | ||
Former [1991/49] | PROCEDE DE SECHAGE | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/19: Verbunden mit 90301323.3/0383484 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 24.03.92 | EPB 1992/19: Consolidated with 90301323.3/0383484 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 24.03.92 | EPB 1992/19: Jointe à la demande no. 90301323.3/0383484 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 24.03.92 | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.1995 | BE | 11.01.1995 | DK | 11.01.1995 | ES | 11.01.1995 | GR | 11.01.1995 | NL | 11.01.1995 | LU | 28.02.1995 | SE | 11.04.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
DK | 11.01.1995 | ||
GR | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 11.04.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
DK | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
SE | 11.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
SE | 11.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 11.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | JP5469689 [ ]; | DE1023002 [ ] (MAHLO HEINZ DR ING); | US3864843 [ ] (HERZHOFF PETER, et al); | US4142301 [ ] (GOODALL CHARLES C O); | WO8808949 [ ] (IMATRAN VOIMA OY [FI]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 3, No. 93 (M-68), 8 August 1979; & JP-A-5469689 (Mitsubishi Denki K.K.) 4 June 1979, & JP5469689 A 19790604 |