EP0462982 - PAGING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED ACKNOWLEDGE-BACK CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1992/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTMAN, Jose 846 N.W. 9th Way Boynton Beach, FL 33426 / US | 02 /
SHAPIRO, Steven, Curtis 8389 Morningstar Road Lake Worth, FL 33467 / US | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903102.3 | 07.02.1990 | [1992/01] | WO1990US00613 | Priority number, date | US19890322159 | 10.03.1989 Original published format: US 322159 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010922 | Date: | 20.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462982 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462982 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G08B23/00 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
H04W88/185 (EP,US);
G08B23/00 (KR);
H04W84/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | PERSONENRUFMELDER MIT RÜCKQUITTIERUNGSFÄHIGKEITEN | [1992/01] | English: | PAGING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED ACKNOWLEDGE-BACK CAPABILITIES | [1992/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE RECHERCHE DE PERSONNES A CAPACITES D'ACCUSE DE RECEPTION EN RETOUR AMELIOREES | [1992/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1991 | Search fee paid | 09.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 09.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0372640 (ERICSSON PAGING SYSTEMS [NL]) | International search | [Y]US4336524 (LEVINE ALFRED B); | [Y]US4517561 (BURKE TIMOTHY M [US], et al); | [Y]US4644351 (ZABARSKY ALAN P [US], et al); | [Y]US4811379 (GRANDFIELD WALTER J [US]) |