EP0458867 - FEMORAL PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURLONG RESEARCH FOUNDATION Lister House Wimpole Street London W1 / GB | [1991/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSBORN, Johannes, Friedrich Poppelsdorferallee 56 D-5300 Bonn / DE | 02 /
FURLONG, Ronald, John 149 Harley Street London W1N 2DE / GB | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Smith, Philip Antony REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1991/49] | Application number, filing date | 90903602.2 | 15.02.1990 | [1991/49] | WO1990GB00245 | Priority number, date | GB19890003464 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8903464 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009154 | Date: | 23.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458867 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458867 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/32, A61L27/00 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61F2/30734 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/3676 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/367 (EP,US);
A61F2/4607 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30032 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30113 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30143 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30224 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30738 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30797 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30813 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30919 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3631 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0017 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0031 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/49] | Title | German: | HÜFTPROTHESE | [1991/49] | English: | FEMORAL PROSTHESIS | [1991/49] | French: | PROTHESE FEMORALE | [1991/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 12.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3605123 (HAHN HENRY); | [A]US3924274 (HEIMKE GUNTHER, et al); | [X]EP0018496 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP0022724 (ANVAR [FR]); | [X]EP0176711 (KAMPNER STANLEY L); | [Y]US4842604 (DORMAN LINNEAUS C [US], et al) |