EP0460026 - HIGH PERFORMANCE AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY COLUMN COMPRISING NON-POROUS, MONODISPERSE POLYMERIC PACKING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALE, Marsha, Denise 200 Weldon Street Rochester, NY 14611 / US | 02 /
SUTTON, Richard, Calvin 113 Wimbledon Road Rochester, NY 14617 / US | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903707.9 | 13.02.1990 | [1991/50] | WO1990US00762 | Priority number, date | US19890312515 | 21.02.1989 Original published format: US 312515 | [1991/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009832 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460026 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08, B01J20/32 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
B01J20/3282 (EP);
B01D15/3804 (EP);
B01J20/321 (EP);
B01J20/3248 (EP);
B01J20/3251 (EP);
B01J20/3255 (EP);
B01J20/327 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/50] | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSAFFINITÄTSCHROMATOGRAPHISCHE SÄULE MIT NICHTPORÖSEM, MONODISPERSEM, POLYMERISCHEM PACKUNGSMATERIAL | [1991/50] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY COLUMN COMPRISING NON-POROUS, MONODISPERSE POLYMERIC PACKING MATERIAL | [1991/50] | French: | COLONNE DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE PAR AFFINITE A HAUTE PERFORMANCE COMPRENANT UN MATERIAU DE GARNITURE POLYMERE NON POREUX, MONODISPERSE | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/18] | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB2172812 [ ]; | EP0165912 [ ]; | EP0071704 [ ]; | US4181636 [ ]; | US4161407 [ ] | [ ] - Journal of Chromatography, Volume 443, No. 1+Index, 29 June 1988, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., (Amsterdam, NL) M.A. ROUNDS et al.: "Synthesis of a Non-Porous, Polystyrene-Based Strong Anion-Exchange Packing Material and its Application to fast High-Performance Liquid Chromatography of Proteins"pages 73-83 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 109, 1988; (Columbus, Ohio, US), E. BAYER et al.: "Application of Monodisperse Polymer Beads in Polymer Supported Peptide Synthesis. Synthesis of Polymer Peptides for Immunological Studies and Affinity Chromatography", see page 708* Abstract 21146h, & Pept. Chem. 1987 (Pub. 1988)263* | [ ] - Journal of Chromatography, Volume 457, 1988, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., (Amsterdam, NL), B. ANSPACH et al.: "Affinity Chromatography with Triazine Dyes Immobilized onto Activated Non-Porous Monodisperse Silicas"see pages 195-204 |