EP0457845 - UNITIZED OIL SEAL AND METHOD OF MAKING A UNITIZED OIL SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION Legal Department P.O. Box 1966 Detroit, MI 48235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION Legal Department P.O. Box 1966 Detroit, MI 48235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASH, Stephen, E. 9700 Zukey Lake Road Lakeland, MI 48143 / US | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [1991/48] | Archer, Philip Bruce Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90904126.1 | 17.01.1990 | [1991/48] | WO1990US00201 | Priority number, date | US19890308920 | 13.02.1989 Original published format: US 308920 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009536 | Date: | 23.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457845 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457845 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
F16J15/3228 (EP,US);
F16J15/00 (KR);
F16J15/3264 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49904 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49915 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1991/48] | Title | German: | KASSETTENDICHTUNG UND IHR HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1991/48] | English: | UNITIZED OIL SEAL AND METHOD OF MAKING A UNITIZED OIL SEAL | [1991/48] | French: | JOINT UNITAIRE ETANCHE A L'HUILE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1991/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.01.1994 | GB | 20.01.1994 | [2004/37] |
Former [1995/03] | GB | 20.01.1994 | Cited in | International search | WO8503990 [ ] (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US]); | GB2082692 [ ] (FREUDENBERG CARL); | GB2140101 [ ] (AEROQUIP) | Examination | US3306223 | US4516783 |