EP0460100 - LIPOSOME GEL COMPOSITION AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIPOSOME TECHNOLOGY, INC. 1050 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [1991/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USTER, Paul, Steven 883 Warren Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
FIELDING, Robert, M. 1806 Stockbridge Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
MORANO, Jacqueline, K. 2124 Rock Street 34 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
MARTIN, Francis, J. 415 West Portal Avenue San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90904557.7 | 22.02.1990 | [1991/50] | WO1990US00918 | Priority number, date | US19890315392 | 24.02.1989 Original published format: US 315392 | US19890356262 | 23.05.1989 Original published format: US 356262 | [1991/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009782 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460100 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K37/36, A61K9/06 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K38/1808 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K8/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/50] | Title | German: | GELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON LIPOSOMEN UND VERFAHREN | [1991/50] | English: | LIPOSOME GEL COMPOSITION AND METHOD | [1991/50] | French: | COMPOSITION LIPOSOMIQUE SOUS FORME DE GEL ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/01] | 27.07.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO8800824 [ ] (LIPOSOME TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | EP0162724 [ ] (VESTAR RESEARCH INC [US]) | [ ] - STN File Server, (Karlsruhe, DE), File Medline, (US. Nat. Library of Medicine) G.L. BROWN et al.: "Acceleration of Tensile Strength of Incisions Treated with EGF and TGF-beta", AN 89061207, Volume 89, & Ann Surg, (1988 Dec) 208 (6) 788-94 | [ ] - STN File Server, (Karlsruhe, DE), File Biosis, Volume 89, Nr 17568, AN 89:29224, Y. ISHII et al.: "Preparation of EGF Labelled Liposomes and their Uptake by Hepatocytes", pages 732-736 & Biochem Biophys Res Commun 160 (2). 1989. 732-736. Coden: BBRCA9 |