EP0417232 - WEB TRAVEL CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erhardt & Leimer GmbH Postfach 10 15 40 D-86136 Augsburg / DE | [1991/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMANN, Heinrich Föhrenring 28 D-4904 Enger / DE | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Fay, Hermann, et al Postfach 17 67 89007 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Fay, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Postfach 17 67 D-89007 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 90904758.1 | 27.03.1990 | [1991/12] | WO1990DE00244 | Priority number, date | DE19893910548 | 01.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3910548 | [1991/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9011954 | Date: | 18.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0417232 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0417232 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/038, B65H23/10 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
B65H23/032 (EP,US);
B65H2404/15212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [1991/12] | Title | German: | BAHNLAUFREGLER | [1991/12] | English: | WEB TRAVEL CONTROLLER | [1991/12] | French: | GUIDE-ETOFFE | [1991/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.1994
07.09.1994
ADMISSIBLE BST-Servo-Technik GmbH Postfach 10 07 85 D-33507 Bielefeld / DE Opponent's representative Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.1994
07.09.1994
ADMISSIBLE BST-Servo-Technik GmbH Postfach 10 07 85 D-33507 Bielefeld / DE Opponent's representative Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.1994
07.09.1994
ADMISSIBLE BST-Servo-Technik GmbH Postfach 10 07 85 D-33507 Bielefeld / DE Opponent's representative Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | 06.10.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.01.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.10.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.11.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3535011 (ERHARDT & LEIMER GMBH [DE]); | [Y]FR2330636 (GOEBEL GMBH MASCHF [DE]); | [Y]GB2053856 (ASTIN FRANCE ASSISTANCE TECH); | [A]EP0178704 (GOEBEL GMBH MASCHF [DE]); | [A]US4598849 (FRYE KENNETH G [US], et al); | [A]GB1154253 (ATELIERS DE CONST MECANIQUES S [FR]) |