EP0463042 - METHOD FOR DETECTION AND/OR IDENTIFICATION OF LIVING MICRO-ORGANISMS BY VIBROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE SAINTE-AGATHE, Nicolas 67, avenue de Breteuil F-75007 Paris / FR | [1992/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90904858.9 | 15.03.1990 | [1992/01] | WO1990FR00171 | Priority number, date | FR19890003403 | 15.03.1989 Original published format: FR 8903403 | [1992/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010712 | Date: | 20.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463042 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, C12M1/34, G01H9/00 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP);
G01N29/2418 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS UND/ODER ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON MIKROORGANISMEN DURCH VIBROMETRIE | [1992/01] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTION AND/OR IDENTIFICATION OF LIVING MICRO-ORGANISMS BY VIBROMETRY | [1992/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION ET/OU D'IDENTIFICATION DE MICRO-ORGANISMES VIVANTS PAR VIBROMETRIE | [1992/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/50] | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0179270 [ ]; | DE888593 [ ]; | DE3039825 [ ] | [ ] - J. Acoust. Soc. Am. Vol. 83, No. 4, Avril 1988, Acoustic Soc. of America (US) S.M. VAN NETTEN: "Laser Interferometer Microscope for the Measurement of Nanometer Vibrational Displacements of a Light-Scattering Microscopic Object"pages 1667-1674 | [ ] - Rev. Sci. Instrum. Vol. 49, No. 6, Juin 1978 American Institute of Physics (US) M.A. NOKES et al.: "Fiber Optic Heterodyne Interferometer for Vibration Measurements in Biological Systems"pages 722-728 | [ ] - J. Acoust. Soc. Am., Vol. 83, No. 2, Fevrier 1988, Acoustical Soc. of America (US) J.F. WILLEMIN et al.: "Heterodyne Interferometer for Submicroscopic Vibration Measurements in the Inner Ear"pages 787-795 |