EP0464103 - CONTROLLER CARD AND ASSOCIATED READING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.1994 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMEUR, Hanafi Klangs Gränd 7 S-752 33 Uppsala / SE | [1992/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Kummelsten, Per Arne UPPSALA PATENTBYRA P.O. Box 9013 750 09 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Kummelsten, Per-Arne UPPSALA PATENTBYRA P.O. Box 9013 S-750 09 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 90905255.7 | 05.03.1990 | [1992/02] | WO1990SE00142 | Priority number, date | SE19890000864 | 13.03.1989 Original published format: SE 8900864 | [1992/02] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010919 | Date: | 20.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464103 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G06K19/06, G06F12/14 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP);
G07C9/215 (EP);
G07C9/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSKARTE UND ASSOZIIERTE LESEEINHEIT | [1992/02] | English: | CONTROLLER CARD AND ASSOCIATED READING UNIT | [1992/02] | French: | CARTE DE COMMANDE ET UNITE DE LECTURE ASSOCIEE | [1992/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1990 | Translation filed | 02.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 03.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/37] | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4795890 (GOLDMAN ROBERT N [US]); | [Y]US4095739 (FOX ROBERT J, et al); | [Y]US3866173 (MOORMAN CHARLES J, et al); | [Y]GB2154344 (NAT RES DEV); | [Y]US4148012 (BAUMP PAUL A, et al); | [Y]WO8803287 (HARCOM SECURITY SYSTEMS CORP [US]) |