EP0420955 - PROCEDURE AND MEANS FOR ATTACHING FILM USED IN COVERED CULTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIODATA OY Konalantie 6-8 A SF-00370 Helsinki / FI | [1991/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUOMINEN, Hannu, Lauri Pallokuja 4 as. 14 SF-01280 Vantaa / FI | 02 /
LINDEBERG, Erkki Mäntyniemen kartano SF-59800 Kesälahti / FI | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/15] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90905548.5 | 12.04.1990 | [1991/15] | WO1990FI00108 | Priority number, date | FI19890001905 | 21.04.1989 Original published format: FI 891905 | [1991/15] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9012494 | Date: | 01.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420955 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420955 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01G13/02 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
A01G13/0287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BEFESTIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR FOLIEN IN ÜBERDECKTEN KULTUREN | [1991/15] | English: | PROCEDURE AND MEANS FOR ATTACHING FILM USED IN COVERED CULTIVATION | [1991/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET MOYENS DE FIXATION DE FILMS UTILISES EN CULTURE COUVERTE | [1991/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.1990 | Translation filed | 28.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 28.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.1993 | BE | 10.03.1993 | CH | 10.03.1993 | DE | 10.03.1993 | DK | 10.03.1993 | ES | 10.03.1993 | FR | 10.03.1993 | IT | 10.03.1993 | LI | 10.03.1993 | NL | 10.03.1993 | SE | 10.03.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
BE | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 10.03.1993 | ||
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
DK | 10.03.1993 | ||
ES | 10.03.1993 | ||
IT | 10.03.1993 | ||
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
FR | 30.07.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
BE | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 10.03.1993 | ||
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
DK | 10.03.1993 | ||
IT | 10.03.1993 | ||
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
FR | 30.07.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
BE | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 10.03.1993 | ||
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
DK | 10.03.1993 | ||
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
FR | 30.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
BE | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 10.03.1993 | ||
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
FR | 30.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/23] | BE | 10.03.1993 | |
CH | 10.03.1993 | ||
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
FR | 30.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/03] | BE | 10.03.1993 | |
CH | 10.03.1993 | ||
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 10.03.1993 | |
CH | 10.03.1993 | ||
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/46] | CH | 10.03.1993 | |
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
SE | 10.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/45] | CH | 10.03.1993 | |
LI | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1810463 ; | [A]US3890910 ; | [A]US3914900 |