EP0472726 - FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.1994 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Akira Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Takahisa Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
OCHIAI, Toshiyuki Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90905644.2 | 28.03.1990 | [1992/10] | WO1990JP00416 | Priority number, date | JP19890118893 | 12.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11889389 | [1992/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013918 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472726 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/60, H01L29/784 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
H01L29/0847 (EP,US);
H01L27/092 (EP,US);
H01L29/66787 (EP,US);
H01L29/785 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/10] | H01L29/784 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/10] | Title | German: | FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR | [1992/10] | English: | FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR | [1992/10] | French: | TRANSISTOR A EFFET DE CHAMP | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1991 | Translation filed | 12.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1991 | Search fee paid | 12.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/03] | 19.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8603341 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | JPH0648670 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | JPH0649662 [ ] (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) | International search | JPS648670 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD); | JPS649662 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | JPS6432677 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | JPS6461060 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | JPS6118175 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | JPS61241978 [ ] (IBM) |